Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236809

EP1236809 - High-hardness martensitic stainless steel excellent in corrosion resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 14.05.2008  [2008/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daido Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha
1-10, Higashisakura 1-chome Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi
Aichi / JP
[2007/02]
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
Daido Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha
11-18, Nishiki 1-chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi 460-8581 / JP
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Daido Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha
11-18, Nishiki 1-chome, Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-8581 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Koga, Takeshi
53-257, Kamakirane, Kagiyacho
Tokai-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Shimizu, Tetsuya
1410, Takashima 2-chome, Tenpaku-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
03 / Noda, Toshiharu
26-11, Wakinoshima 4-chome
Tajimi-shi, Gifu / JP
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Schorr, Frank Jürgen , et al
Diehl & Partner GbR
Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Schorr, Frank, Dr. , et al
Diehl Glaeser Hiltl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date02004544.927.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateJP2001005246327.02.2001         Original published format: JP 2001052463
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1236809
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1236809
Date:03.03.2004
[2004/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236809
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/18, C22C38/00, C22C38/42
[2004/10]
Former International [2002/36]C22C38/18, C22C38/20, C22C38/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/48]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Martensitischer rostfreier Stahl mit hoher Härte und mit guter beständigkeit gegen Korrosion[2002/36]
English:High-hardness martensitic stainless steel excellent in corrosion resistance[2002/36]
French:Acier inoxydable martensitique à haute dureté, ayant une bonne résistance à la corrossion[2002/36]
Examination procedure14.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
10.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2006Fee for grant paid
21.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.09.2006
GB27.02.2007
[2008/20]
Former [2007/37]IT06.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3901470  (VER SCHMEIDEWERKE GMBH) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 2, line 38 - line 40; example A *;
 [A]DE4212966  (VER SCHMIEDEWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 5,7 * page 3, line 66 - line 67; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0446188  (SANDVIK AB [SE])