Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241288

EP1241288 - Three-dimensional non-woven fabric, method and mold for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyoda Boshoku Corporation
1-banchi, 1-chome, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi
Aichi-pref., 448-8651 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Toyoda Boshoku Corporation
1-banchi, 1-chome Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi-pref., 448-8651 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takagaki, Takanari
Toyoda Boshoku Corp., 1-banchi, 1-chome,Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-pref., 448-8651 / JP
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date02004546.427.02.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateJP2001007120813.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001071208
JP2001035501820.11.2001         Original published format: JP 2001355018
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241288
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241288
Date:20.11.2002
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1241288
Date:20.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/56
[2002/47]
Former International [2002/38]D04H1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/32]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dreidimensionaler Vliesstoff, Verfahren und Form zu deren Herstellung[2002/38]
English:Three-dimensional non-woven fabric, method and mold for manufacturing the same[2002/38]
French:Tissu non-tissé tridimensionnel, méthode et moule pour le fabriquer[2002/38]
Examination procedure18.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
21.05.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2005Fee for grant paid
24.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR20.07.2005
GB27.02.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/27]GB27.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US4103058  (HUMLICEK LARRY D) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0428400  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 3, line 4 - page 3, line 13 * * page 6, line 50 - page 6, line 54 * * page 7, line 32 - page 7, line 33 * * page 8, line 20 - page 10, line 7; figures 2-7; examples 2-6; claims 18-21 *;
 [X]WO9947010  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 7, line 2 - page 8, line 24; figures 5-8 *;
 [A]WO0029656  (ELDIM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5643653  (GRIESBACH III HENRY LOUIS [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4741941  (ENGLEBERT STEPHEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH04305213
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930318), vol. 017, no. 131, Database accession no. (C - 1036), [A] 1-7 * abstract *