Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238646

EP1238646 - Hair care product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH
Pfungstädter Str. 92-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2003/12]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
GOLDWELL GmbH
Postfach
64280 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Link, Thorsten, Dr.
Auerbacher Strasse 9b
64319 Pfungstadt / DE
02 / Weichaus, Dirk
Bahnhofstrasse 46
64404 Bickenbach / DE
03 / Cajan, Christine
Bahnhofstrasse 4
56130 Bad Ems / DE
 [2002/37]
Application number, filing date02004613.228.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateDE200110982001.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10109820
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238646
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238646
Date:21.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/81, A61K8/86, A61Q5/06
[2006/13]
Former International [2002/37]A61K7/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Former [2003/22](deleted) 
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Haarbehandlungsmittel[2002/37]
English:Hair care product[2002/37]
French:Produit de traitement capillaire[2002/37]
Examination procedure01.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
04.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2006Fee for grant paid
21.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22]
Request for further processing for:20.05.2005Request for further processing filed
20.05.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.06.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.04.2003AT   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003BE   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003CH   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003CY   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003DK   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003ES   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003FI   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003GB   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003GR   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003IE   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003IT   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003LU   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003MC   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003NL   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003PT   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003SE   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
04.04.2003TR   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
TR21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
LU28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
LU28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/29]FI21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
AT28.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/20]FI21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/04]FI21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/48]FI21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/37]FI21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/25]FI21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/22]FI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/19]FI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/12]FI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2006/52]FI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE21.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0985405  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0014] , [0022] - [0027] - [0032] , [0034] - [0036] - [0043] * [Y] 3;
 [X]US5972356  (PEFFLY MARJORIE MOSSMAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 11 *;
 [PX]US2001002254  (DUFFER DALAL IBRAHIM [US], et al) [PX] 1,3 * paragraphs [0043] , [0118]; example 1 *;
 [Y]EP0897711  (WELLA AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007]; examples 9-11 *