Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260674

EP1260674 - Turbine blade and turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/20]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8010 / JP
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Segawa, Kiyoshi
12-6-1, Nishinarusawa-cho 3-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0032 / JP
02 / Shikano, Yoshio
16-10-10, Aoba-cho
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0056 / JP
03 / Yamazaki, Yoshiaki
19-11, Kanesawa-cho 6-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0015 / JP
04 / Senoo, Shigeki
5-17-4, Suwa-cho 4-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0001 / JP
05 / Nakayama, Yoshiharu
4-1-406, Nakanarusawa-cho 2-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0033 / JP
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2002/48]
Application number, filing date02004678.528.02.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateJP2001014860618.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001148606
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260674
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260674
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/14
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/33]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Turbine und Turbinenschaufel[2002/48]
English:Turbine blade and turbine[2002/48]
French:Turbine et aube de turbine[2002/48]
Examination procedure20.01.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/30]
08.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2009Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2010Fee for grant paid
31.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
19.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US5292230  (BROWN WILMOTT G [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 4,5; claims 1,7 *;
 [X]US5480285  (PATEL ASHOK T [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 7, lines 4-13; figure 7 *;
 [X]  MADAVAN N K ET AL, "REDESIGNING GAS-GENERATOR TURBINES FOR IMPROVED UNSTEADY AERODYNAMIC PERFORMANCE USING NEURAL NETWORKS", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS. NEW YORK, US, (200105), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0748-4658, pages 669 - 677, XP001050809 [X] 1-10 * page 673, paragraph 5; figures 6,13 *
 [X]  MAN MOHAN RAI ET AL, "NAVIER-STOKES ANALYSES OF THE REDISTRIBUTION OF INLET TEMPERATURE DISTORTIONS IN A TURBINE", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS. NEW YORK, US, (19900501), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 0748-4658, pages 276 - 282, XP000126903 [X] 1-10 * page 279, paragraph 4; figure 6 *
 [X]  RAO K V ET AL, "VANE-BLADE INTERACTION IN A TRANSONIC TURBINE, PART I: AERODYNAMICS", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS. NEW YORK, US, (19940501), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 0748-4658, pages 305 - 311, XP000442520 [X] 1-10 * page 310, paragraph 3 - page 311, paragraph 1; figures 11,13 *
 [X]  ARNONE A ET AL, "MULTIGRID CALCULATION OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL VISCOUS CASCADE FLOWS", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS. NEW YORK, US, (19930701), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 0748-4658, pages 605 - 614, XP000377977 [X] 1-10 * page 310, paragraph 4 - page 311, paragraph 1; figures 11,13 *