Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237366

EP1237366 - Methods and apparatus for the provision of user selected advanced closed captions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.09.2006  [2006/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION
101 Tournament Drive
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
General Instrument Corporation
101 Tournament Drive
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Safadi, Reem
429 Brown Briar Circle
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
02 / Reamer, Sean Anthony
408 South Stone Ridge Drive
Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US
03 / Depietro, Mark
655 Brampton Lane
Harleysville, Pennsylvania 19438 / US
04 / Barkley, Chuck
921 Langdon Avenue
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02004810.402.03.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS2001079868202.03.2001         Original published format: US 798682
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237366
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1237366
Date:01.12.2004
[2004/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/445
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/34]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Auslieferung von durch den Anwender augewählten verbesserten Untertiteln[2002/36]
English:Methods and apparatus for the provision of user selected advanced closed captions[2002/36]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la délivrance de sous-titres avancés sélectionnés par l'utilisateur[2002/36]
Examination procedure25.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/30]
28.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/36]
13.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5742352  (TSUKAGOSHI IKUO [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,8,14,15,26,31,33-35,38,44,45,56 * column 2, line 55 - line 57 * * column 3, line 1 - line 21 * * column 8, line 7 - line 40 * * column 9, line 5 - line 10 * * column 12, line 10 - line 16 * * column 13, line 11 * * column 13, line 34 - line 41 * * column 14, line 36 - line 40 * * column 15, line 1 - line 41 * * column 18, line 28 - line 64 * * figures 1,6,8 * * column 12, line 64 - line 67 * * column 13, line 1 - line 11 * * column 18, line 57 - line 60 * [Y] 6,7,9,10,12,18,36,37,39,40,42,48;
 [Y]US5576768  (GOMIKAWA TAKAO [JP]) [Y] 18,48 * column 2, line 10 - line 30 *;
 [YA]EP0662770  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 12,42 * page 12, line 4 - line 14 * [A] 1,3-5,31,33-35,61,62;
 [Y]WO0057642  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [Y] 10,40 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPH11196386  ;
 [A]US4568981  (BEAULIER DANIEL A [US]) [A] 1,12,14,31,42,44,61,62 * column 5, line 13 - line 26 *;
 [Y]JPH06225174
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, [Y] 9,39 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 07, [Y] 6,7,36,37 * the whole document *