Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239508

EP1239508 - Color picture tube [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2010
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2010  [2010/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Etou, Hideaki
81-5, Ikaganishimachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0066 / JP
02 / Kato, Atsushi
3-702, Chudojibojo-cho, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8811 / JP
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Stippl, Hubert , et al
Patentanwälte
Freiligrathstrasse 7a
90482 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]Stippl, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2002/37]Stippl, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing.
Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date02004855.904.03.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateJP2001006132006.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001061320
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239508
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239508
Date:05.01.2005
[2005/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01J29/07, H01J29/18, H01J29/81
[2005/01]
Former International [2002/37]H01J29/07, H01J29/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/38]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Farbbildröhre[2002/37]
English:Color picture tube[2002/37]
French:Tube d'image couleur[2002/37]
Examination procedure08.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/18]
06.07.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.10.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
07.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/12]
04.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.08.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0487106  (TOSHIBA KK [JP])