EP1238703 - Carbon monoxide selective oxidizing catalyst and manufacturing method for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurachi, Saeko c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004860.9 | 04.03.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | JP20010060060 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001060060 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238703 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1238703 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/44, B01J29/67, H01M8/06, C01B3/58, B01J29/32 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
B01J29/068 (EP,US);
B01J29/44 (EP,US);
B01J29/46 (EP,US);
B01J29/67 (EP,US);
B01J29/68 (EP,US);
C01B3/583 (EP,US);
H01M8/0668 (EP,US);
B01J29/064 (EP,US);
B01J29/076 (EP,US);
C01B2203/044 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/37] | B01J29/44, B01J29/67, H01M8/06, C01B3/58 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/04] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Katalysator für die selektive Oxidation von Kohlenmonoxid und Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung | [2002/37] | English: | Carbon monoxide selective oxidizing catalyst and manufacturing method for the same | [2002/37] | French: | Catalyseur pour l' oxydation sélective du monoxyde de carbone et procédé de sa préparation | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 27.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/28] | Divisional application(s) | EP03028064.8 / EP1403218 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4385195 (BUTTER STEPHEN A, et al) [X] 1,4,15,18,22 * column 10, line 3 - line 13; claims 1,8-11; table 2 *; | [X]US4837397 (ABSIL ROBERT P L [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 66; claims 1,5,13,15,19 *; | [X]US5609751 (WALL ROBERT G [US]) [X] 1,4,15,18 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 65; claims 1,4 *; | [X]US5648585 (MURRAY BRENDAN DERMOT [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * column 4, line 58 - column 7, line 38; claims 1,4,6,8,19,20 *; | [X]EP0888815 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,15,18,22-24 * page 6, line 44 - page 7, line 14; claims 1,7 *; | [X]EP1059264 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 39 - line 57; figure 1; claims 8,9 *; | [T] - WEIDENTHALER, C., FISCHER, R.X., SHANNON, R.D., "Pitfalls in the powder diffraction analysis of zeolites ZSM-5 and ZSM-8", POWDER DIFFRACTION, (1994), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 204 - 212, XP008011280 [T] 1 * page 211 - page 212; table 2 * | [T] - WEIDENTHALER, C., FISCHER, R.X., SHANNON, R.D., "he essential identity of the framewor structures of ZSM-5 and ZSM-8", STUD.SURF. SCI. CATAL., (1994), vol. 84, pages 551 - 558, XP008011275 [T] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2991(08)64157-9 |