Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239530

EP1239530 - Solid polymer electrolyte fuel cell assembly, fuel cell stack, and method of supplying reaction gas in the fuel cell assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.04.2013  [2013/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2012/17]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugiura, Seiji
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP
02 / Wariishi, Yoshinori
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP
03 / Enjoji, Naoyuki
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP
04 / Sugita, Narutoshi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP
 [2012/15]
Former [2002/37]01 / Sugiura, Seiji
K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP
02 / Wariishi, Yoshinori
K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP
03 / Enjoji, Naoyuki
K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP
04 / Sugita, Narutoshi
K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2002/37]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date02004962.305.03.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateJP2001006152706.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001061527
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239530
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239530
Date:26.10.2005
[2005/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239530
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/24, H01M8/04, H01M8/10
[2005/23]
Former International [2002/37]H01M8/24, H01M8/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/27]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Brennstoffzellenanordnung mit festen Polymerelektrolyten, Brennstoffzellenstapel und Verfahren zur Reaktionsgasversorgung in der Brennstoffzellenanordnung[2002/37]
English:Solid polymer electrolyte fuel cell assembly, fuel cell stack, and method of supplying reaction gas in the fuel cell assembly[2002/37]
French:Assemblage de piles à combustible à électrolyte polymère solide, empilement de piles à combustible et procédé pour la fourniture de gaz de réaction dans l'assemblage des piles à combustible[2002/37]
Examination procedure09.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/06]
18.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2012Fee for grant paid
27.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2006
Opposition(s)28.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.04.2012
[2013/11]
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH04355061  ;
 [XY]EP0967675  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,11-19 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0052] - [0062] * [Y] 4-6,18;
 [Y]JPH01151163  ;
 [Y]JPS63248073  ;
 [E]EP1241726  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-7,11-20 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO02071526  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-7,11-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19905564  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 4-7,18 * column 2, lines 10-43 *;
 [AP]AT407589B  (VAILLANT GMBH [AT]) [AP] 4-7,18 * figures 4-7 * * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 9 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930430), vol. 017, no. 219, Database accession no. (E - 1358), & JP04355061 A 19921209 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,11-19 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890911), vol. 013, no. 410, Database accession no. (E - 819), & JP01151163 A 19890613 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 4-6,18 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890209), vol. 013, no. 058, Database accession no. (E - 714), & JP63248073 A 19881014 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 4,18 * abstract *
ExaminationUS5773160
by applicantJPH04355061
 EP0967675
 US5773160