Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239061

EP1239061 - Electroplating Installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2010  [2010/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Voss, Reinhold
Bahnhofstrasse 52
22955 Hoisdorf / DE
02 / Wittenbecher, Nils
Wiesenstieg 4
21509 Glinde / DE
 [2002/37]
Application number, filing date02005140.507.03.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateDE2001204072U08.03.2001         Original published format: DE 20104072 U
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239061
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239061
Date:03.03.2004
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/05, C25D21/12, C25D19/00
[2004/10]
Former International [2002/37]C25D21/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Galvanikanlage[2002/37]
English:Electroplating Installation[2002/37]
French:Installation de galvanisation[2002/37]
Examination procedure19.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/43]
25.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/12]
06.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0031597  (M & R AUTOMATISIERUNG VON INDU [AT], et al) [Y] 1,3,14,19 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 36 * * claims 1,16 *;
 [Y]US4055751  (BUSSMANN EGON, et al) [Y] 1,3,14,19 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19740974  (WOHLENBERG BUCHBINDERSYSTEME G [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,11 * figure 2 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE19826169  (KAESER KOMPRESSOREN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,11 * figure 1 * * page 1, lines 14-28,51 - page 2, line 10 * * column 6, lines 17-23 * * column 7, lines 26-42 *;
 [A]DE4416795  (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,14,19 * figure 1 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4235186  (DICON DINKEL IND AUTOMATION GM [DE]) [A] 1,3 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 40 *;
 [A]US4765878  (KOMOTO HARUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4068677  (DE STEUR HUBERT, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *