EP1241431 - Guidance system for missile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/38] | Guidance structure for missile | ||
[2005/49] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl BGT Defence GmbH & Co. KG Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 13 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Diehl BGT Defence GmbH & Co.KG Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 13 88662 Überlingen / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 88662 Überlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krogmann, Uwe Zur Äsche 24 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2004/46] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys., et al Weisse + Wolgast, Bökenbusch 41 42555 Velbert / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005151.2 | 07.03.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | DE20011012692 | 16.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112692 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241431 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F41G7/22 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
F41G7/22 (EP);
F41G7/2226 (EP);
F41G7/2253 (EP);
F41G7/2293 (EP);
G01S13/723 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Lenkvorrichtung für Flugkörper | [2005/49] | English: | Guidance system for missile | [2005/49] | French: | Système de guidage pour missile | [2005/49] |
Former [2002/38] | Lenkstruktur für Flugkörper | ||
Former [2002/38] | Guidance structure for missile | ||
Former [2002/38] | Structure de guidage pour missile | Examination procedure | 31.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 19.03.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.12.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5253823 (LAWRENCE RICHARD V [GB]) [A] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 32 - column 12, line 24; figures 1-4 * * column A *; | [A]DE4218600 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 14 - page 7, line 14; figures 1-12 * * abstract *; | [APD]EP1174675 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [APD] 1-5* the whole document * | by applicant | EP1174675 |