Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243687

EP1243687 - Textile material for garments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.2007  [2007/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deotexis Inc.
885 Third Avenue, Suite 2900
New York, N.Y. 10022-4838 / US
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Tebbe, Gerold
11, Av. Princesse Grace
MC-98000 Monte Carlo / MC
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Ostertag, Reinhard
Ostertag & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestrasse 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Ostertag, Reinhard
Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02005193.408.03.2002
[2002/39]
Priority number, dateDE200111212214.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10112122
[2002/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1243687
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1243687
Date:28.05.2003
[2003/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:D06H1/00, D06Q1/10, B44F1/10
[2003/22]
Former International [2002/39]D06H1/00, D06Q1/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
TitleGerman:Textilmaterial für Kleidungsstücke[2002/39]
English:Textile material for garments[2002/39]
French:Matériau textile pour vêtements[2002/39]
Examination procedure27.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
01.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/12]
06.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200504   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2005
31.03.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5941572  (GUNDJIAN ARSHAVIR [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4681791  (SHIBAHASHI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,12,14,15 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 60 * * column 7, line 16 - column 9, line 48 * * column 20, line 47 - line 52; example 24 *;
 [X]US4397142  (BINGHAM WALLACE K) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,12 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 59 * * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 2; claims 11-15 *;
 [X]EP0751010  (PILOT INK CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-7,11,12,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3172942  (H. A. BERG) [X] 1,2,4,8,12,15 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 36 * * column 7, line 8 - line 59 *;
 [X]CH608749  (BATA SCHUHE AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,11,12,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]CH607608  (ANDREW JOHN BERNHARD [CH]) [X] 1,5-8,11,12,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19543333  (HOLLAND LETZ HORST DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,2,11,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4103060  (BINGHAM WALLACE KARL, et al) [A] 1-3,8,9,11,14,15 * column 9, line 20 - line 64; claims 1,7 *