blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1241002

EP1241002 - Planographic printing plate precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210, Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2006/06]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimada, Kazuto
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Sorori, Tadahiro
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date02005289.012.03.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateJP2001006916812.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001069168
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241002
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241002
Date:02.01.2004
[2004/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1241002
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:B41C1/10
[2002/38]
CPC:
B41C1/1008 (EP,US); B41C1/1016 (EP,US); B41C2201/02 (EP,US);
B41C2201/14 (EP,US); B41C2210/04 (EP,US); B41C2210/06 (EP,US);
B41C2210/20 (EP,US); B41C2210/22 (EP,US); B41C2210/24 (EP,US);
Y10S430/145 (EP,US); Y10S430/165 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:Flachdruckplattenvorläufer[2002/38]
English:Planographic printing plate precursor[2002/38]
French:Précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique[2002/38]
Examination procedure17.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/16]
23.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2005Fee for grant paid
05.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
CY08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
FR08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
TR08.02.2006
LU12.03.2006
IE13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
GR09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/52]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
FR08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
TR08.02.2006
LU12.03.2006
IE13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
GR09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2008/38]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
TR08.02.2006
LU12.03.2006
IE13.03.2006
FR31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
GR09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2008/37]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
TR08.02.2006
LU12.03.2006
IE13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
GR09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2008/20]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
IE13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
GR09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2007/37]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
IE13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2007/13]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
IE13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2007/12]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
IE13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2007/10]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2006/52]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
Former [2006/45]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
Former [2006/43]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
ES19.05.2006
Former [2006/42]CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
ES19.05.2006
Former [2006/36]FI08.02.2006
ES19.05.2006
Former [2006/34]ES19.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0934110  ;
 [A]WO0048836  (KODAK POLYCHROME GRAPHICS CO [US], et al) [A] 1-17* claims 1,4,6,9 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09034110 A 19970207 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
by applicantJPS58125246
 JPS58173696
 JPS5984356
 JPS59202829
 JPS6078787
 US5340699
 JPH07103171
 JPH08108621
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.