Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241500

EP1241500 - Optical fiber connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.12.2004  [2004/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hirose Electric Co., Ltd.
5-23 Osaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
HIROSE ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-23 Osaki 5-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuchida, Masahiro, Hirose Electric Co., Ltd.
5-23, Osaki 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8587 / JP
02 / Kobayashi, Masaru, NTT Intell. Prop. Center
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
03 / Abe, Yoshiteru, NTT Intell. Prop. Center
3-9-11, Midori-cho, Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
 [2003/07]
Former [2002/38]01 / Tsuchida, Masahiro, Hirose Electric Co., Ltd.
5-23, Osaki 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8587 / JP
02 / Kobayashi, Masaru, NTT Intell. Prop. Center
3-9-11, Midori-cho, Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
03 / Abe, Yoshiteru, NTT Intell. Prop. Center
3-9-11, Midori-cho, Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date02005367.414.03.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateJP2001007361315.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001073613
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241500
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241500
Date:09.10.2002
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/38
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/27]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lichtleitfaser-Steckverbinder[2002/38]
English:Optical fiber connector[2002/38]
French:Connecteur de fibres optiques[2002/38]
Examination procedure20.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
13.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH08292344  ;
 [X]US5694506  (KOBAYASHI MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 16, line 33 - column 17, line 34; figure 20 *;
 [X]US5155787  (CARPENTER JAMES B [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US4506946  (HODGE MALCOLM H [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 19; figure 2 * * column 4, line 51 - line 54 * * column 5, line 5 - line 20 * * column 10, line 42 - column 11, line 5; figures 7,15 *;
 [X]US3885859  (DALGLEISH JACK FRANK, et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 3,5 *;
 [X]US5257334  (TAKAHASHI MITSUO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figure 3A *;
 [X]US3946467  (LUKAS HELMUT H, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 11 - line 26; figures 17,18 *;
 [X]JPS57139716
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821130), vol. 006, no. 241, Database accession no. (P - 158), [X] 1,3 * abstract *