Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240946

EP1240946 - Impact mill with pivotable impact apron [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2007  [2007/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAZEMAG & EPR GmbH
Brokweg 75
48249 Dülmen / DE
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Heukamp, Volker
Martin-Luther-Strasse 12
49525 Lengerich / DE
 [2002/38]
Application number, filing date02005480.509.03.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateDE200111295917.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10112959
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240946
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1240946
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:B02C13/09
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:Prallmühle mit verschwenkbarem Prallwerk[2002/38]
English:Impact mill with pivotable impact apron[2002/38]
French:Broyeur à impact avec écran d' impact orientable[2002/38]
Examination procedure11.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
03.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/14]
07.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200403   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2004
31.03.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3128953  (F.WAGENEDER) [X] 1,3,5 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 3; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 * [Y] 2;
 [YA]US6059210  (SMITH LEWARD N [US]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 53; figure 2 * [A] 1,3,4;
 [X]US4049206  (KONIG ROLF, et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 9 - column 5, line 47; figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]US1496213  (FRICKEY EDWARD H) [X] 1 * Gesamt-Dokument;; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,4;
 [A]US5503340  (DOPPSTADT WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 20; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]US3850375  (FORD F) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 23 - column 5, line 38; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US4047673  (AULMANN HERBERT, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 51; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4449673  (CAMERON WALLACE C [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 12; figures 1,2,4 *
by applicantDE3911086
 DE1607456
 DE4312509