Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241364

EP1241364 - Bolt and method of clamping members using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.05.2008  [2008/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD.
101-2 Yagotohonmachi, Showa-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[2006/33]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD.
101-2 Yagotohonmachi, Showa-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kondo, Shinichi
Aoyama Seisakusho Co. Ltd., 8, Takahashi 1-chome
Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Ozawa, Junzo
Aoyama Seisakusho Co. Ltd., 8, Takahashi 1-chome
Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Mizuno, Masataka
Aoyama Seisakusho Co. Ltd., 8, Takahashi 1-chome
Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Aoyama, Kazutaka
Aoyama Seisakusho Co. Ltd., 8, Takahashi 1-chome
Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken / JP
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Betten & Resch
Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date02005779.013.03.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateJP2001006974413.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001069744
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241364
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241364
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1241364
Date:16.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16B39/00, F16B39/30, F16B39/34, F16B39/02
[2003/01]
Former International [2002/38]F16B39/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/39]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bolzen und diesen verwendendes Verfahren zum Spannen von Bauteilen[2002/38]
English:Bolt and method of clamping members using the same[2002/38]
French:Boulon et procédé utilisant ledit boulon pour assembler des pièces[2002/38]
Examination procedure27.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
13.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2006Fee for grant paid
30.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB13.03.2007
[2008/20]
Documents cited:Search[X]US6135689  (MATSUNAMI SHIGEKI [JP]) [X] 1-8,17 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 34 * * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 8 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]GB1134375  (UNITED CARR INC) [X] 1,9,13-15 * page 1, line 69 - line 72 * * figure - *;
 [X]US3182703  (SMYTH GEORGE F) [X] 1,10,13-15 * column 4, line 28 - line 34 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2956293  (MCKAY THOMAS L, et al) [X] 1,11,13-15 * column 4, line 40 - line 59 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]GB566254  (FRANK BIRCHALL) [X] 1,12-15 * page 2, line 18 - line 22 * * figure - *;
 [X]US4768908  (FAUCHET CHRISTIAN R [FR]) [X] 1,16 * abstract * * figure - *