Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1246444

EP1246444 - Voice transmitter for encoding and transmitting a DTMF signal and an audio signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2002/40]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fushimi, Wataru, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2002/40]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Former [2002/40]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02005900.214.03.2002
[2002/40]
Priority number, dateJP2001010156930.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001101569
[2002/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1246444
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1246444
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1246444
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/06, H04Q1/46
[2002/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/30]
Former [2002/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sprachsender zur Kodierung und Übertragung eines MFV- und Audio- Signals[2002/40]
English:Voice transmitter for encoding and transmitting a DTMF signal and an audio signal[2002/40]
French:Emetteur vocal pour codage et transmission de signaux DTMF et audio[2002/40]
Examination procedure04.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
31.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2005Fee for grant paid
05.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2000358260  ;
 [YA]EP1059782  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * * column 5, lines 30-40 * * column 9, lines 9-11 * * claims 1,6-8 * [A] 8-10;
 [A]EP0579927  (ROLM CO [US]) [A] 1,5 * claims 1-3,8 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, [Y] 1,2,4-7 * abstract *