Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1261240

EP1261240 - Apparatus for discharge lamps with safe ignition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Raiser, Franz, Dr.
Willibaldstr. 153
80689 München / DE
02 / Reiter, Bernhard
Hohenwaldeckstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 [2002/48]
Application number, filing date02005923.414.03.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateDE200112463618.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10124636
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1261240
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1261240
Date:16.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:H05B41/288
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/33]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betriebsgerät für Entladungslampen mit sicherer Zündung[2002/48]
English:Apparatus for discharge lamps with safe ignition[2002/48]
French:Appareil pour des lampes à décharge avec un allumage sûr[2002/48]
Examination procedure07.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/11]
07.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2004Fee for grant paid
05.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US4544863  (HASHIMOTO KEN [JP]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 18 - column 3, line 23 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 28 - column 4, line 36 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 15 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]DE2705969  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-6 * page 9, line 4 - page 13, line 3 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]EP0831678  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0351012  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *