blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1241754

EP1241754 - Spark plug for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.03.2009
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.04.2009  [2009/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi-pref., 448-0029 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Denso Corporation
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-0029 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hori, Tsunenobu
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-0029 / JP
02 / Ishino, Yasutake
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-0029 / JP
03 / Osamura, Hironori
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-0029 / JP
04 / Mitsuhashi, Akira
Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1230 Kamihideya
Okegawa-shi, Saitama-ken 363-0026 / JP
05 / Okuma, Mineo
Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1230 Kamihideya
Okegawa-shi, Saitama-ken 363-0026 / JP
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/38]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02005975.415.03.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateJP2001007452615.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001074526
JP2002005647701.03.2002         Original published format: JP 2002056477
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241754
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241754
Date:19.03.2008
[2008/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2008
ClassificationIPC:H01T13/39
[2002/38]
CPC:
H01T13/39 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/48]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zündkerze für Verbrennungsmotor[2002/38]
English:Spark plug for an internal combustion engine[2002/38]
French:Bougie d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne[2002/38]
Examination procedure20.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/15]
30.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2009/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6389638  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES)[A] 1;
 [A]EP0577103  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH08232030  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al) [A] 1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.