EP1243201 - Retaining or locking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tisch & Stuhl Willisau AG 6130 Willisau / CH | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wipplinger, Norni Oberwyberg 2 6212 St. Erhard / CH | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | TSWpat Luzern AG Eisengasse 17 6004 Luzern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Kemény AG Patentanwaltbüro Eisengasse 17 6004 Luzern / CH | Application number, filing date | 02006069.5 | 18.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | CH20010000509 | 20.03.2001 Original published format: CH 5092001 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243201 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47B1/00, B66D5/16 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
B66D5/16 (EP);
A47B1/00 (EP);
A47B87/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/24] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Festhalte- oder Arretiervorrichtung | [2002/39] | English: | Retaining or locking device | [2002/39] | French: | Dispositif de retenue ou d'arrêt | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.05.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4215936 (HAUSS ANTON DR [CH]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 52 * * figure - *; | [A]DE19627794 (RUEEGG TONY [CH], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 8, line 50 - line 54 * * column 9, line 3 - line 52 * * figures 13,14,14A,15 * |