Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1244085

EP1244085 - Information assisting system and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2010
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.07.2010  [2010/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ichihara, Naohiko, c/o Sougoukenkyusho
Pioneer Corporation, 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken 350-2288 / JP
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Popp, Eugen , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Popp, Eugen , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2002/39]Popp, Eugen, Dr. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date02006121.418.03.2002
[2002/39]
Priority number, dateJP2001007859619.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001078596
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1244085
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1244085
Date:29.09.2004
[2004/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/34, G08G1/0968, G08G1/127, H04Q7/38
[2004/40]
Former International [2002/39]G08G1/09
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/24]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hilfsystem und Gerät für Informationen[2002/39]
English:Information assisting system and apparatus[2002/39]
French:Système et appareil d'assistance à l'information[2002/39]
Examination procedure04.02.2005Examination requested  [2005/14]
18.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0715289  (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6028553  (OBERSTEIN KARLA [DE]) [X] 1,10,17,29,30 * abstract * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 35 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 14 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9845823  (DUROCHER JEAN MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-32 * page 1, line 6 - line 20 * * page 2, line 28 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6, line 23 - line 32 * * page 8, line 28 - line 30 * * page 9, line 12 - page 11, line 6 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]US5543789  (BEHR DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,10,17,29,30 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 42 * * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 54 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO0042562  (GLOBAL RESEARCH SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * page 1, line 16 - line 28 * * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, line 7 - line 12 * * page 5, line 23 - page 7, line 8 * * page 8, line 11 - page 10, line 14 * * page 11, line 3 - page 13, line 11 * * page 14, line 19 - line 26 * * page 18, line 22 - page 20, line 19 * * page 25, line 3 - page 26, line 9 * * figures 5,6 *