Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258354

EP1258354 - Ink-jet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8442 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8442 / JP
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8442 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Hidehiro, c/o Toshiba Tec Kabuschiki k.
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
02 / Kubota, Atsushi, c/o Toshiba Tec Kabuschiki k.
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
03 / Shimizu, Megumi, c/o Toshiba Tec Kabuschiki k.
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2002/47]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date02006219.620.03.2002
[2002/47]
Priority number, dateJP2001014671416.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001146714
JP2001026030429.08.2001         Original published format: JP 2001260304
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1258354
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1258354
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258354
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/155, B41J3/54, B41J2/515
[2003/26]
Former International [2002/47]B41J2/155
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2004/12]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät[2002/47]
English:Ink-jet recording apparatus[2002/47]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement par jet d'encre[2002/47]
Examination procedure20.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
16.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2006Fee for grant paid
18.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.04.2007
FR25.04.2007
[2008/52]
Former [2008/24]BE25.04.2007
FR21.12.2007
Former [2008/04]BE25.04.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0968832  (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,10 * column 6, line 19 - column 8, line 41; figures 3,5,17 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]JP2000071482  ;
 [A]WO0064680  (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 16 - page 3, line 24; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0960737  (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 55; figure 2 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, [Y] 2 * abstract *