Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243834

EP1243834 - Hinge joint on pipes for roofs or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lafarge Roof System Components GmbH & Co. KG
Frankfurter Landstrasse 2-4
61437 Oberursel / DE
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Harald
Herminghauser Strasse 24
58256 Ennepetal / DE
02 / Riedel, Bernd
Hundeickerstrasse 13
58285 Gevelsberg / DE
03 / Hülsenbeck, Sigfried
Jahnstrasse 20
58285 Gevelsberg / DE
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Grundmann, Dirk , et al
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Grundmann, Dirk, Dr. , et al
c/o Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date02006230.320.03.2002
[2002/39]
Priority number, dateDE200111436923.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10114369
[2002/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243834
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16L27/08
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesAL20.12.2002
LT20.12.2002
LV20.12.2002
MK20.12.2002
RO20.12.2002
SI20.12.2002
TitleGerman:Gelenkverbindung an Rohren für Dächer oder dergleichen[2002/39]
English:Hinge joint on pipes for roofs or the like[2002/39]
French:Raccord articulé destiné aux tuyaux situes sur des toits ou equivalent[2002/39]
Examination procedure20.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
19.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/21]
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5064226  (KLAS DANIEL E [US]) [X] 1-5,13 * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 31; figures 8-12 * [A] 6-12;
 [AD]DE4314675  (KLOEBER JOHANNES [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 16 *;
 [A]DE3937645  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,13 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 29; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]DE2733571  (KESSEL BERNHARD) [A] 1-13 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 3; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE9005386U  (BETONWERKE HEINRICH HESS KG) [A] 6-10 * figures 1,4 *