Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243667

EP1243667 - Gas recirculation flow control method and apparatus for use in vacuum system for semiconductor manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawasaki, Hiroyuki, Ebara Corporation
11-1 Haneda, Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Oiwa, Tokuhisa, Toshiba K. K., Yokohama Complex
8, Shinsugita-cho, Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Sakai, Itsukoa, Toshiba K. K., Yokohama Complex
8, Shinsugita-cho, Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2002/39]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02006584.321.03.2002
[2002/39]
Priority number, dateJP2001008284122.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001082841
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1243667
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1243667
Date:02.10.2002
[2002/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/50, H01L21/00, C23C16/455, C23C16/44
[2002/40]
Former International [2002/39]C23C16/50, H01L21/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/26]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gasrückführungsflussregelung zur Verwendung im Vakuumsystem für die Halbleiterherstellung[2002/39]
English:Gas recirculation flow control method and apparatus for use in vacuum system for semiconductor manufacture[2002/39]
French:Méthode et appareil de controle de flux de recirculation d'un gas pour système de fabrication de semiconducteur sous vide[2002/39]
Examination procedure27.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/22]
27.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2009Invitation to provide information on prior art
06.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2010Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art
26.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/10]
30.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
27.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200403   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2004
31.03.201413   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]JPH10125657  ;
 [Y]US4728869  (JOHNSON NOEL H [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH09251981  ;
 [A]EP0983791  (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH0841626  ;
 [PA]US2001051232  (SAKAI ITSUKO [JP], et al) [PA] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [Y] 1,3-7 * abstract * [A] 2,8-11
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, [A] 1-11 * abstract *
by applicantJPH10125657
 US4728869
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), no. 10,