Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1262640

EP1262640 - Exhaust line of an internal engine, especially diesel engine from utility vehicules such as trucks or buses, with an integrated device for treating an exhaust gas an attenuate noise [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/49]Exhaust line of an internal engine, especially diesel engine from utility vehicles such as trucks or buses, with an integrated device for treating an exhaust gas an attenuate noise
[2002/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 50 06 20
80976 München / DE
For all designated states
ROTH-TECHNIK AUSTRIA Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Eisenwerk 14
3193 St. Aegyd/Neuwalde / AT
[2002/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Jacob, Eberhard, Dr.
Karwendelstrasse 25
82152 Krailling / DE
02 / Mai, Hans-Peter
Hailweg 9
76456 Kuppenheim / DE
 [2002/49]
Application number, filing date02006845.826.03.2002
[2002/49]
Priority number, dateDE200112335814.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10123358
[2002/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1262640
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1262640
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F01N1/08, F01N7/02, F01N3/023, B01D49/02, B03C3/017, B03C3/45, F01N3/033, F01N3/035, B01D53/94, F01N3/02
[2002/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2003/35]
Former [2002/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Abgasstrang einer Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere Dieselmotor eines Nutzfahrzeuges wie Lastkraftwagen oder Omnibus, mit integrierten Abgasnachbehandlungs- und Schalldämpfungsvorrichtungen[2002/49]
English:Exhaust line of an internal engine, especially diesel engine from utility vehicules such as trucks or buses, with an integrated device for treating an exhaust gas an attenuate noise[2002/50]
French:Ligne d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne, plus particulièrement d'un moteur diesel d'un véhicule utilitaire tel qu'un poids lourd ou un bus, comportant un dispositif de traitement des gaz d'échappement et d'insonorisation intégré[2002/50]
Former [2002/49]Exhaust line of an internal engine, especially diesel engine from utility vehicles such as trucks or buses, with an integrated device for treating an exhaust gas an attenuate noise
Former [2002/49]Ligne d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne, plus particulièrement d'unmoteur diesel d'un véhicule utilitaire tel qu'un poids lourd ou un bus, comportant un dispositif de traitement des gaz d'échappement et d'insonorisation intégré
Examination procedure28.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
01.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2003Fee for grant paid
17.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE19934932  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [AD] 1,21-31 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 20; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO9218226  (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 6, line 19 - line 26; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0484925  (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 25 - line 46; figure 1 *;
 [A]US6038854  (PENETRANTE BERNARDINO M [US], et al) [A] 1,21 * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 58; figure 3 *