blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1255429

EP1255429 - Electronic equipment and board insertion/removal apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2011
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 23.11.2011  [2011/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0052 / JP
[2010/11]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0052 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Momiyama, Hiroaki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
02 / Mokutani, Takao
c/o Sony EMCS Corporation Kosai TEC, 554, Sakaijuku
Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP
 [2010/11]
Former [2002/45]01 / Momiyama, Hiroaki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
02 / Mokutani, Takao
Sony EMCS Corporation Kosai TEC, 554, Sakaijuku
Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Straße 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date02007029.827.03.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateJP2001010459903.04.2001         Original published format: JP 2001104599
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255429
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255429
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:H05K7/14
[2002/45]
CPC:
H01R12/82 (EP,US); H05K7/1409 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/30]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Leiterplatte und Einfuhr-/Ausziehvorrichtung dafür[2009/41]
English:Electronic equipment and board insertion/removal apparatus therefor[2002/45]
French:Carte a équipment électronique, et appareil pour l'insertion et le retrait desdit carte[2002/45]
Former [2002/45]Leiterplatte und Einführ/Auszieh-vorrichtung dafür
Examination procedure11.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/07]
15.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2010Fee for grant paid
29.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT17.03.2010
FR17.05.2010
ES28.06.2010
DE01.10.2010
[2011/47]
Former [2011/14]IT17.03.2010
ES28.06.2010
DE01.10.2010
Former [2011/13]ES28.06.2010
DE01.10.2010
Former [2010/46]ES28.06.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9955127  (TRIONIQ INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 9; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]DE19832058  (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4517625  (FRINK ATTILA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 9 - column 18; figures 2,3,5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.