Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256701

EP1256701 - Intake system for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.06.2005  [2005/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Lang, Heinz
Nussstrasse 48
85253 Erdweg / DE
 [2002/46]
Application number, filing date02007801.006.04.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateDE200112318512.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10123185
[2002/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256701
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256701
Date:11.06.2003
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256701
Date:30.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:F02B27/02
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/10]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sauganlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine[2002/46]
English:Intake system for an internal combustion engine[2002/46]
French:Système d'alimentation pour un moteur à combustion interne[2002/46]
Examination procedure05.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
06.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2004Fee for grant paid
10.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE4102453  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-3,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19634913  (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19728600  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-3,9 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4102453