Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260431

EP1260431 - Vehicle having a steering damper system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/48]Steering damper system for vehicles
[2008/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2008/52]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hasegawa, Yosuke c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama / JP
02 / Itabashi, Takeyasu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama / JP
03 / Hayashi, Kanji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama / JP
04 / Wakabayashi, Takeshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama / JP
05 / Bunya, Osamu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama / JP
06 / Harada, Tomoyuki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama / JP
 [2008/52]
Former [2002/48]01 / Hasegawa, Yosuke
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Itabashi, Takeyasu
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Hayashi, Kanji
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
04 / Wakabayashi, Takeshi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
05 / Bunya, Osamu
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
06 / Harada, Tomoyuki
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
Representative(s)Liska, Horst , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date02007920.809.04.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateJP2001015706825.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001157068
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260431
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260431
Date:01.10.2003
[2003/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260431
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:B62K21/08
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2004/26]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeug mit einem Lenkungsdämpfer[2008/37]
English:Vehicle having a steering damper system[2008/37]
French:Véhicule avec un amortisseur de direction[2008/37]
Former [2002/48]Lenkungsdämpfer für Fahrzeuge
Former [2002/48]Steering damper system for vehicles
Former [2002/48]Amortisseur de direction pour véhicules
Examination procedure18.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/03]
16.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2008Fee for grant paid
06.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0900722  (CRC CENTRO RICERCHE CAGIVA S A [SM]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2710651  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantJPS6364888
 JPH0774023