Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260158

EP1260158 - Drawer for furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  11.07.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Julius Blum GmbH
Industriestrasse 1
6973 Höchst / AT
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]For all designated states
Julius Blum GmbH
Industriestrasse 1
6973 Höchst / AT
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Julius Blum Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Industriestrasse 1
6973 Höchst / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Held, Wolfgang
Holzlütweg 7
6971 Hard / AT
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Torggler, Paul Norbert , et al
Torggler & Hofinger
Patentanwälte
Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Torggler, Paul Norbert, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556
6021 Innsbruck / AT
Application number, filing date02007955.410.04.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateAT2001000078517.05.2001         Original published format: AT 7852001
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260158
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260158
Date:23.04.2003
[2003/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260158
Date:09.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/45]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1260158
Date:13.08.2008
Language:DE
[2008/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/00
[2003/16]
Former International [2002/48]A47B88/00, A47B77/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   IT [2004/03]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Möbelschublade[2002/48]
English:Drawer for furniture[2002/48]
French:Tiroir pour pièce de meuble[2002/48]
Examination procedure13.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/42]
24.10.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.02.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
11.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2005Fee for grant paid
10.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.08.2006  07.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstrasse 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 02  09.08.2006  09.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Grass GmbH
Grass Platz 1
6973 Höchst / AT
Opponent's representative
Dobler, Markus
Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Großtobeler Straße 39
88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/38]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.2006   
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstrasse 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 02  09.08.2006   
Grass GmbH
Grass Platz 1
6973 Höchst / AT
Opponent's representative
Dobler, Markus
Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Former [2006/37]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.2006   
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstrasse 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
15.09.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.01.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.02.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
25.02.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.02.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.06.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.06.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.12.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
04.12.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH04338421  ;
 [XA]DE19705779  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 38; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-13;
 [YA]JPH06205711  ;
 [A]US3028209  (HINKEL LESTER H, et al) [A] 8 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 8; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]JPH07184769
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930412), vol. 017, no. 185, Database accession no. (C - 1047), [X] 1,4,5,7 * abstract * [Y] 8
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941027), vol. 018, no. 562, Database accession no. (C - 1265), [Y] 8 * abstract * [A] 9-11
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, [A] 1,7 * abstract *
OppositionDE3106068
 DE20018317U
 US4178626
 US6169655
 JPH05199666