Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239478

EP1239478 - Information recording medium, information recording method and information recording/reproduction system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2011
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.12.2011  [2011/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Gotoh, Yoshiho
5-1-3, Higashinakahama, Jotoku
Osakashi, Osaka 536-0023 / JP
02 / Ito, Motoshi
17-25-302, Furuichi 3chome, Jotoku
Osakashi, Osaka 536-0001 / JP
03 / Ueda, Hiroshi
4-3426, Gotenyamaminamimachi
Hirakatashi, Osaka 573-1193 / JP
04 / Fukushima, Yoshihisa
14-C-508, Sekime 6chome, Jotoku
Osakashi, Osaka 536-0008 / JP
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25
1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH
Former [2002/37]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date02007956.201.02.2000
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateJP1999002446201.02.1999         Original published format: JP 2446299
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1239478
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239478
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/18
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Informationsaufzeichnungsverfahren, und Informationsaufzeichnungs/wiedergabe System[2002/37]
English:Information recording medium, information recording method and information recording/reproduction system[2002/37]
French:Support d'enregistrement de l'information, méthode d'enregistrement de l'information et système d'enregistrement/reproduction[2002/37]
Examination procedure30.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
21.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2010Fee for grant paid
20.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00101918.1  / EP1026681
Divisional application(s)EP10170761.0  / EP2239738
EP10170762.8  / EP2239739
Opposition(s)20.10.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
16.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0350920  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 7, line 8 - line 16 * * page 7, line 33 - line 42 * * page 11, line 16 - line 24 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US5548572  (KULAKOWSKI JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 27 * * figures 1,2,4A *
 [Y]  "DYNAMIC SPARE SECTOR ALLOCATION IN HARD DISK DRIVE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19950501), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0018-8689, page 257, XP000519571 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *