Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260196

EP1260196 - Illumination device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ivoclar Vivadent AG
Bendererstrasse 2
9494 Schaan / LI
[2013/24]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Firma Ivoclar Vivadent AG
Bendererstrasse 2
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Plank, Wolfgang
Hopfengarten 16
6830 Rankweil / AT
02 / Rohner, Gottfried
Forststrasse 6
9450 Altstätten / CH
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Baronetzky, Klaus
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[2013/24]
Former [2002/48]Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date02008014.910.04.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateDE200112534123.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10125341
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260196
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260196
Date:21.05.2003
[2003/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260196
Date:12.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61C19/00, A61C13/15, H01L33/00
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:Beleuchtungsvorrichtung[2002/48]
English:Illumination device[2002/48]
French:Dispositif d'éclairage[2002/48]
Examination procedure17.06.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/34]
29.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2013Fee for grant paid
15.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.12.2004
Opposition(s)13.03.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
TR12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
[2016/33]
Former [2016/31]CY12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/52]DK12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/21]DK12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/14]FI12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/11]IT10.04.2013
FI12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/08]FI12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2013/49]FI12.06.2013
GR13.09.2013
ES23.09.2013
Former [2013/48]ES23.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5634711  (KENNEDY JOHN [CA], et al) [X] 1,19 * column 4, line 43 - line 49 * * figure 6 * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]DE4302897  (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1090607  (MECTRON S R L [IT]) [X] 1,19 * column 5, line 22 - line 33 * * claims 1,3 *
by applicantEP1090607
 DE4302897
 US5634711