Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321748

EP1321748 - Gas flow rate measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd.
2477, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi
Ibaraki 312-0062 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]For all designated states
Hitachi Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd.
2477, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi
Ibaraki 312-0062 / JP
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Hitachi Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd.
2477, Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0062 / JP
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd.
2477, Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0062 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsumura, Takafumi
Yuko-Ryo B401, 1477-2, Tabiko
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0063 / JP
02 / Katagishi, Kenichi
212-179, Koya
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0002 / JP
03 / Matsumoto, Masahiro
24-1-105, Kuji-cho 2-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1222 / JP
04 / Hanzawa, Keiji
1807-53, Motoyoshida-cho
Mito-shi, Ibaraki 310-0836 / JP
 [2008/47]
Former [2003/26]01 / Matsumara, Takafumi
Yuko-Ryo B401, 1477-2, Tabiko
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0063 / JP
02 / Katagishi, Kenichi
212-179, Koya
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0002 / JP
03 / Matsumoto, Masahiro
24-1-105, Kuji-cho 2-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1222 / JP
04 / Hanzawa, Keiji
1807-53, Motoyoshida-cho
Mito-shi, Ibaraki 310-0836 / JP
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02008191.516.04.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateJP2001037002304.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001370023
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321748
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321748
Date:14.09.2005
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321748
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/696
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/22]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Gasdurchflussmessung[2003/26]
English:Gas flow rate measuring device[2003/26]
French:Dispositif de mesure du débit d' un gaz[2003/26]
Examination procedure11.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/11]
30.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2008Fee for grant paid
12.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5335186  (TARRANT RICHARD T [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 16 - line 18 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 59; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0606983  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 18 - column 7, line 11; figures 1-11 *;
 [DA]JPH06207842  ;
 [DA]JPH05223611  ;
 [PX]WO0198736  (SENSIRION AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-5 * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 36; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]US4581929  (SUGIURA NOBORU [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column W *;
 [DA]JPS60100218
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, [DA] * column A *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931208), vol. 017, no. 666, Database accession no. (P - 1656), [DA] 1-9 * abstract *