EP1254650 - Hair dye composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2007/29] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Yoshinori, Kao Corporation, Res. Lab. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
Koike, Kenzo, Kao Corporation, Res. Lab. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008285.5 | 22.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | JP20010124256 | 23.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001124256 | JP20010124257 | 23.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001124257 | JP20010124258 | 23.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001124258 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254650 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1254650 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254650 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/10, A61K8/49, A61K8/41 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
A61K8/492 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Haarfärbemittel | [2002/45] | English: | Hair dye composition | [2002/45] | French: | Produit pour la coloration des cheveux | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9920236 (COTTERET JEAN ; LANG GERARD (FR); OREAL (FR)) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 7, line 18 - line 27 * * page 8, line 21 - line 29 *; | [X]DE19827000 (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,4 * example B1; claims 1,7,8,21 * * page 3, line 3 - line 17 *; | [X]WO9920234 (AUDOUSSET MARIE PASCALE ; LANG GERARD (FR); OREAL (FR)) [X] 1,4 * example 1; claims 1,11,14,16 * * page 31, line 20 - line 22 *; | [A]FR2662701 (OREAL) [A] 1,4 * examples 3,5,6; claims 1,4,10,11 *; | [A]DE4208297 (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |