EP1254957 - Method for producing an L-amino acid substance by fermentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/45] | Method for producing target substance by fermentation | ||
[2008/28] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Change - German title | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | 16.12.2011 | Change - English title | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | 16.12.2011 | Change - French title | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | 16.12.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/01] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsujimoto, Nobuharu, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Fermentation & Biotechn. Laboraty 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Tomoko, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Fermentation & Biotechn. Laboraty 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Ito, Hisao, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Fermentation & Biotechn. Laboraty 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2002/45] | 01 /
Tsujimoto, Nobuharu, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Fermentation & Biotechn. Laboraty, 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Tomoko, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Fermentation & Biotechn. Laboraty, 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Ito, Hisao, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Fermentation & Biotechn. Laboraty, 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2012/03] |
Former [2002/45] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008316.8 | 11.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | JP20010135517 | 02.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001135517 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254957 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1254957 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254957 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1254957 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C07K14/245, C12P13/04, C12P13/08, C12P13/22, // (C12P13/04, C12R1:185) | [2012/03] | CPC: |
C07K14/245 (EP,US);
C12P13/04 (EP,US);
C12P13/08 (EP,US);
C12P13/222 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | C12N15/31, C07K14/245, C12P13/04, C12P13/08, C12P13/22, // (C12P13/04, C12R1:185) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/24] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer L-Aminosäure mittels Fermentation | [2012/03] | English: | Method for producing an L-amino acid substance by fermentation | [2012/03] | French: | Procédé de production d'un L-aminoacide désiré par fermentation | [2012/02] |
Former [2002/45] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zielsubstanz mittels Fermentation | ||
Former [2002/45] | Method for producing target substance by fermentation | ||
Former [2002/45] | Procédé de production d'une substance désirée par fermentation | Examination procedure | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2006
16.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Intellectual Property Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2006
16.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Intellectual Property Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2006
16.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Intellectual Property Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2006
Degussa AG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | 09.11.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.05.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.05.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.05.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.11.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.10.2008 | Appeal received No. T2224/08 | 14.12.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.05.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 04.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 04.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4346170 (SANO KOUNOSUKE, et al) [DA] 1-8* the whole document *; | [DA] - ZENG G Q ET AL, "MUTATIONAL ANALYSIS OF THE ENZYME III-GLC OF THE PHOSPHOENOLPYRUVATE PHOSPHOTRANSFERASE SYSTEM IN ESCHERICHIA-COLI", RESEARCH IN MICROBIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 143, no. 3, ISSN 0923-2508, pages 251 - 261, XP008019812 [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-2508(92)90017-I | [DA] - DEAN D A ET AL, "REGULATION OF THE MALTOSE TRANSPORT SYSTEM OF ESCHERICHIA-COLI BY THE GLUCOSE-SPECIFIC ENZYME III OF THE PHOSPHOENOLPYRUVATE-SUGAR PHOSPHOTRANSFERASE SYSTEM CHARACTERIZATION OF INDUCER EXCLUSION-RESISTANT MUTANTS AND RECONSTITUTION OF INDUCER EXCLUSION IN PROTEOLIPOSOMES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 265, no. 34, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21005 - 21010, XP002248552 [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * | [DA] - KUEHNAU S ET AL, "THE ACTIVITIES OF THE ESCHERICHIA-COLI MALK PROTEIN IN MALTOSE TRANSPORT REGULATION AND INDUCER EXCLUSION CAN BE SEPARATED BY MUTATIONS", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 173, no. 7, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 2180 - 2186, XP008019807 [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * |