EP1262349 - Process for controling a window blind [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwantner, Bernhard Josef-Haas-Weg 1 85072 Eichstätt / DE | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Frank AUDI AG Abteilung I/ET-3 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Thielmann, Frank AUDI AG Abteilung I/ET-3 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008375.4 | 12.04.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | DE2001126682 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10126682 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262349 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1262349 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262349 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/20, B60J3/02 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
B60J1/2011 (EP);
E05F15/689 (EP);
E05Y2900/55 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/49] | B60J1/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/33] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Fensterjalousie | [2002/49] | English: | Process for controling a window blind | [2002/49] | French: | Procédé pour contrôler un store pour fenêtre | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4331359 (SHELDON STEVE S) [A] 1,10,11 * column 1, line 52 - line 61 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 55; figures 1,5,8 *; | [X]DE3222861 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,11 * page 4, line 5 - line 10 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 13; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2173752 (LEUNG YEE TOK) [A] 1,11* page 2, line 60 - line 95; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5165188 (TSIROS GEORGE N [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 42; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5873621 (KUIGHADUSH DANNY H [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 29; figures 1,10 * |