Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257025

EP1257025 - Surface emitting semiconductor laser device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.05.2006  [2006/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shinagawa, Tatsuyuki
The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 6-1, Marunouchi
2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Yokouchi, Noriyuki
The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 6-1, Marunouchi
2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Shina, Yasukazu
The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 6-1, Marunouchi
2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Kasukawa, Akihiko
The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 6-1, Marunouchi
2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Pätzold, Herbert
Pasinger Strasse 6
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Pätzold, Herbert, Dr.-Ing.
Steubstrasse 10
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date02008568.416.04.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateJP2001011971518.04.2001         Original published format: JP 2001119715
JP2001038904021.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001389040
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1257025
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1257025
Date:06.04.2005
[2005/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/183
[2002/46]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/52]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Oberflächenemitierende Halbleiterlaservorrichtung[2002/46]
English:Surface emitting semiconductor laser device[2002/46]
French:Dispositif laser à semiconducteur à émission par la surface[2002/46]
Examination procedure07.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/20]
07.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.11.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.11.2005M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH1168235  ;
 [XYA]EP1081817  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,26 * abstract * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 5 * * column 12, lines 29-38 * * column 3, lines 22-45 * [Y] 29-34 [A] 8,11,16;
 [A]JPH0677135
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, [X] 1,2,26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0020] - [0031] * [A] 8,11-25,27-34
 [XA]  - CHAND N ET AL, "MIGRATION AND GETTERING OF SI, BE, AND AMBIENT-RELATED O IN ALGAAS/GAAS LASER STRUCTURES", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (199203), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 1071-1023, pages 807 - 811, XP000277887 [X] 1,2,26 * the whole document * [A] 1-34

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.586121
 [AY]  - UEKI N ET AL, "SINGLE-TRANSVERSE-MODE 3.4-MW EMISSION OF OXIDE-CONFINED 780-NM VCSEL'S", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199912), vol. 11, no. 12, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1539 - 1541, XP000924489 [A] 1,8,11,16,26 * the whole document * [Y] 29-34

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.806839
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940620), vol. 018, no. 324, Database accession no. (E - 1564), [A] 1-34 * abstract *