Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260859

EP1260859 - A method and system for processing of photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.06.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rider, Christopher B.
c/o Kodak Limited, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 4TY / GB
02 / Dartnell, Nicholas J.
c/o Kodak Limited, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 4TY / GB
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Freeman, Avi
Kodak Limited
Patent Department
W92-3A Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Freeman, Avi
Kodak Limited, Patent Department W92-3A,Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date02008923.122.04.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateGB2001001218018.05.2001         Original published format: GB 0112180
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260859
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260859
Date:13.08.2003
[2003/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:G03C5/395, G03D3/06, G03C11/02
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/19]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Verarbeitung eines photographischen Materials[2002/48]
English:A method and system for processing of photographic material[2002/48]
French:Procédé et système pour le traitement d'un produit photographique[2002/48]
Examination procedure15.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/31]
01.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4204930  (IRIBE SEIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,7-11,13 * column 1, line 13 - line 29 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 24 * * column 3, line 31 - line 33 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 27; figure 2 * [Y] 2-4,6,12;
 [Y]US5961939  (KULP JAMES R [US], et al) [Y] 4,12 * column 1, line 39 - line 50 *;
 [Y]US4207157  (HIRAI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 45 - line 68 * * column 3, line 14 - line 16 *;
 [X]EP0741323  (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 14-16 * page 3, line 36 - line 50; claims 1,7,10 *;
 [D]US5701545  (FYSON JOHN RICHARD [GB], et al)
 [Y]  P.J.MUTTER ET AL., "Silver recovery management for motion-picture laboratories", SMPTE JOURNAL., SMPTE INC. SCARSDALE, N.Y., US, (198409), vol. 93, no. 9, ISSN 0036-1682, pages 808 - 817, XP002071874 [Y] 2,3 * page 809, column M, line 48 - line 50 *