EP1256716 - Method of producing shoe for swash plate type compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiura, Manabu, Kabushiki K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Sugioka, Takahiro, Kabushiki K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Onoda, Akira, Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Murakami, Tomohiro, Kabushiki K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Ohkubo, Shino, Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/46] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008965.2 | 22.04.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | JP20010139540 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001139540 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256716 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256716 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256716 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/08 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
F04B27/0886 (EP,US);
B21K1/76 (KR);
Y10T29/49236 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4924 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49995 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/35] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gleitschuhherstellungsverfahren für Schrägscheibenkompressor | [2002/46] | English: | Method of producing shoe for swash plate type compressor | [2002/46] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un patin de compresseur à plateau en biais | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4512175 (KAKU YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 48-51 * * column 6, lines 48-50 * * figures 3,7,8 *; | [A]US5950480 (FUKUSHIMA EIJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 12-21 * * column 4, lines 38-50 * * figures 9A,9B,10 *; | [A]EP0939224 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 1 * |