Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1252980

EP1252980 - Hair removing device with a lotion applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.2011
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 15.08.2012  [2012/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd.
1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka / JP
[2009/08]
Former [2002/44]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saitou, Atsuhiro
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
02 / Iwasaki, Jyuzaemon
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
03 / Araki, Masakatsu
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
04 / Tanaka, Hideki
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
05 / Yamasaki, Masanobu
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
06 / Katou, Hirokazu
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
 [2010/10]
Former [2002/44]01 / Saitou, Atsuhiro, c/oMatsushita Electric Works, Ltd
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
02 / Iwasaki, Jyuzaemon, c/oMatsushita Elect. Works, Ltd
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
03 / Araki, Masakatsu, c/oMatsushita Electric Works, Ltd
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
04 / Tanaka, Hideki, c/oMatsushita Electric Works, Ltd
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
05 / Yamasaki, Masanobu, c/oMatsushita Elect. Works, Ltd
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
06 / Katou, Hirokazu, c/oMatsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
Representative(s)Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Appelt, Christian W.
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/48]Appelt, Christian W.
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/44]Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02009160.924.04.2002
[2002/44]
Priority number, dateJP2001018080514.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001180805
JP2001013308227.04.2001         Original published format: JP 2001133082
[2002/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1252980
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1252980
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1252980
Date:10.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B26B19/40, A45D26/00
[2003/26]
Former International [2002/44]B26B19/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/12]
Former [2002/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Haarentfernungsgerät mit Lotionsapplikator[2002/44]
English:Hair removing device with a lotion applicator[2002/44]
French:Dispositif d'épilation avec applicateur de lotion[2002/44]
Examination procedure12.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/07]
30.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.05.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
06.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
08.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2010Fee for grant paid
26.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.03.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
02.03.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR10.05.2010
GB10.06.2010
[2012/33]
Former [2011/35]GB10.06.2010
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5337478  (COHEN ZAKI [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-7 * [A] 3;
 [X]US3176392  (GWINN ROBERT P) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 64 - column 6, line 76; figures 1-8 * * column 6, line 68 - column 7, line 28 *;
 [A]US3090119  (IVAR JEPSON) [A] 1,2 * column 9, line 59 - column 10, line 24; figure 2 *;
 [X]DE19907222  (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-7 *
by applicantWO9808661