Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255419

EP1255419 - Display enclosure having thin speaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gilbarco Inc.
7300 West Friendly Avenue
Greensboro, NC 27410 / US
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Gromatzky, Jonathan A.
805 Eagle Point Drive
Greensboro, NC 27284 / US
02 / Long, Joseph D.
4906 Hickory Woods Drive
Greensboro, NC 27410 / US
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date02009200.323.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateUS2001084047123.04.2001         Original published format: US 840471
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255419
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1255419
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/02, H04R7/04
[2004/03]
Former International [2002/45]H04R1/02
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/41]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anzeigegehäuse mit einem dünnen Lautsprecher[2002/45]
English:Display enclosure having thin speaker[2002/45]
French:Boîtier d'affichage comprenant un haut-parleur mince[2002/45]
Examination procedure15.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
10.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/15]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.08.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
20.08.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.08.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0002417  (NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,13,30,32,35,36 * page 1, line 14 - line 28 * * page 10, line 8 - page 12, line 124; figures 1-4 * [Y] 9-12,14-29,31,33,34;
 [Y]US4252211  (MATSUDA ATSUSHI, et al) [Y] 9-12,23-26,31 * abstract * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 48; figures 4,5 *;
 [Y]WO9709842  (VERITY GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 14-27,33 * page 77, line 1 - page 78, line 29; figures 47-49 *;
 [Y]US4250550  (FLEISCHER DONALD W [US]) [Y] 28,29,34 * abstract * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 31; claim 2 * * column 2, line 9 - line 63 *