blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1253044

EP1253044 - Buzzer driving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.04.2013  [2013/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city
Mie 510-8503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/44]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uemura, Hideaki, c/oSumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
02 / Wakana, Kenji, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
 [2010/27]
Former [2002/44]01 / Uemura, Hideaki, c/oSumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
02 / Wakana, Kenji, c/o/oSumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB
Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/44]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date02009462.925.04.2002
[2002/44]
Priority number, dateJP2001012719425.04.2001         Original published format: JP 2001127194
[2002/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1253044
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1253044
Date:21.04.2010
[2010/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2010
ClassificationIPC:B06B1/02, G06F1/025, H03K7/08
[2012/22]
CPC:
H03K7/08 (EP,US); B06B1/0238 (EP,US); G06F1/025 (EP,US);
B06B2201/52 (EP,US); B06B2201/70 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2010/16]B60Q9/00, G08B3/10, H03K5/00, H03K21/08
Former IPC [2002/44]B60Q9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2010/52]
Former [2002/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Summerantriebsvorrichtung[2002/44]
English:Buzzer driving apparatus[2002/44]
French:Appareil de commande pour avertisseur[2002/44]
Examination procedure23.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/44]
22.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.11.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
21.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/14]
13.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/14]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0076129  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 2-10* page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 22; figures 3-4 *;
 [Y]US5371772  (AL-KHAIRI SAMER [US]) [Y] 1 * column 1, lines 7-12 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 61; figures 2-3 *;
 [Y]JPH09114467  (MITSUBISHI AUTO ENG, et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantEP0076129
 US5371772
 JPH09114467
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.