Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255031

EP1255031 - Control system and method for vehicle having an internal combustion engine with turbocharger and a transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2013
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2013  [2013/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
Former [2012/51]For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Yasushi, c/oToyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2012/51]
Former [2002/45]01 / Ito, Yasushi, c/oToyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2012/51]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/45]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02009677.229.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateJP2001013550702.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001135507
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255031
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1255031
Date:28.06.2006
[2006/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255031
Date:19.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:F02B67/00, F02B67/10
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesDE [2012/51]
Former [2007/10]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Kraftfahrzeugmotors mit Turbolader und Transmission[2002/45]
English:Control system and method for vehicle having an internal combustion engine with turbocharger and a transmission[2002/45]
French:Dispositif et méthode de réglage d'un moteur à véhicule avec turbo-surchargeur et transmission[2002/45]
Examination procedure29.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
31.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2012Fee for grant paid
09.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.07.2006
Opposition(s)20.09.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19815712  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column A * * column 1, line 49 - column 1, line 54 * * column 2, line 12 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 43 - column 2, line 46 *;
 [X]US6209323  (SCHMIDT ERWIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 8 - column 2, line 14 * * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 39 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 5 *;
 [PX]US2002006848  (TABATA ATSUSHI [JP]) [PX] 1-8 * figures 6,10,12 * * column 1, paragraph 10 - column 1, paragraph 13 *;
 [A]US3913419  (SALE DWIGHT B, et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6089018  (BISCHOFF ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH11310062