Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256313

EP1256313 - Cuff of wrist-mount blood pressure monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho, Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
[2007/48]
Former [2004/35]For all designated states
Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho, Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 600-0084 / JP
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamakoshi, Ken-Ichi
3-5-57-201 Wakunami Kanazawa-shi
Ishikawa 920-6953 / JP
02 / Oku, Shojiro c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd
24,Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
03 / Tanaka, Takahide c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi,Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku Kyoto-shiouchi
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
04 / Sano, Yoshihiko c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi,Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
05 / Kato, Hiroyuki c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
 [2007/48]
Former [2007/46]01 / Yamakoshi, Ken-Ichi
3-5-57-201 Wakunami Kanazawa-shi
Ishikawa 920-6953 / JP
02 / Oku, Shojiro c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd
24,Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
03 / Tanaka, Takahide c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
04 / Sano, Yoshihiko c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
05 / Kato, Hiroyuki c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
Former [2002/46]01 / Yamakoshi, Ken-Ichi
3-5-57-201 Wakunami Kanazawa-shi
Ishikawa 920-6953 / JP
02 / Oku, Shojiro Omron Corp. 801 Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
03 / Tanaka, Takahide Omron Corp 801 Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
04 / Sano, Yoshihiko Omron Corp 801 Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
05 / Kato, Hiroyuki Omron Corp 801 Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
Representative(s)Kilian, Helmut
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner
Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Kilian, Helmut, Dr.
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date02009705.129.04.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateJP2001013595507.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001135955
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256313
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256313
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256313
Date:28.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/022
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/33]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Am Handgelenk zu tragende Manschette eines Blutdruckmessgeräts[2002/46]
English:Cuff of wrist-mount blood pressure monitor[2002/46]
French:Manchette d'un sphygmomanomètre, destiné à être porté au poignet[2002/46]
Examination procedure26.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/22]
28.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
20.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2007Fee for grant paid
27.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
09.07.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2000229070  ;
 [AY]EP1075846  (HOLMES JAMES [CA]) [A] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0027]; figures 7A-7C * [Y] 8;
 [XY]JP2000350706  ;
 [A]FR2568464  (MO FIZ TEKHN [SU]) [A] 1,7 * page 58, line 20 - page 59, line 33; figure 13 *;
 [A]JPS6472726  ;
 [A]EP0615722  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 5-7 * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 48; figure 2 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, [X] 1,2,5-7 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figures 5,9 * [Y] 3,4,8
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, [X] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0038] - [0041]; figures 9-14 * [Y] 3,4
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890623), vol. 013, no. 275, Database accession no. (C - 610), [A] 2,7,8 * abstract *