Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255350

EP1255350 - Signal amplifying method, signal amplifier and devices related therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ok-Sang, Jin
12-304, Woosin Apt., San 70-1, Hwagok 5-Dong, Gangseo-Gu
Seoul 157-797 / KR
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02009761.430.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateKR2001002430104.05.2001         Original published format: KR 2001024301
KR2001008878031.12.2001         Original published format: KR 2001088780
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255350
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1255350
Date:10.03.2004
[2004/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:H03F3/30, H03F3/217
[2003/51]
Former International [2002/45]H03F3/30
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/49]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Signalverstärker und Verfahren zur Signalverstärkung[2002/45]
English:Signal amplifying method, signal amplifier and devices related therewith[2002/45]
French:Amplificateur et méthode d'amplification de signaux[2002/45]
Examination procedure30.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
11.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/32]
08.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time  [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.12.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5084704  (PARRISH WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 2,7 *;
 [A]US4201909  (DOGLIOTTI RENATO [IT], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 7,8 *
 [A]  DODDS D E ET AL, "Video distribution on optical fiber using pulse position modulation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WESTERN CANADA CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER, POWER AND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS IN A RURAL ENVIRONMENT. (WESCANEX). REGINA, MAY 29 - 30, 1991, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910529), ISBN 0-87942-594-6, pages 300 - 304, XP010037870 [A] 1,2 * figures 6,7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WESCAN.1991.160564