Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256379

EP1256379 - STRUCTURED PACKING FOR MASS TRANSFER WITH FLOW RESTRICTING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/46]Structured packing for mass transfer with flow restricting means
[2017/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 23.05.2018  [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
De Dietrich Process Systems GmbH
Hattenbergstrasse 36
55122 Mainz / DE
[2017/06]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
QVF Engineering GmbH
Hattenbergstrasse 36
55122 Mainz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dichtl, Gottfried
Fuststrasse 24
55268 Nieder-Olm / DE
02 / Dietl, Steffen
Hauptstrasse 49
55546 Hackenheim / DE
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Widenmayerstraße 49
80538 München / DE
[2017/23]
Former [2014/24]Andrae Westendorp
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/46]Andrae, Steffen, Dr. , et al
Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date02009784.630.04.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateDE200112218908.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10122189
[2002/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256379
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256379
Date:29.01.2003
[2003/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256379
Date:07.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/32
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2017/23]
Former [2003/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Former [2003/42]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:GEORDNETE STOFFAUSTAUSCHPACKUNG MIT RANDABWEISERN[2017/02]
English:STRUCTURED PACKING FOR MASS TRANSFER WITH FLOW RESTRICTING MEANS[2017/02]
French:GARNISSAGE STRUCTURÉ POUR TRANSFERT DE MATIÉRE AVEC DES ÉLEMENTS POUR RÉDUIRE L'ÉCOULEMENT LE LONG DE LA PAROI[2017/02]
Former [2002/46]Geordnete Stoffaustauschpackung mit Randabweisern
Former [2002/46]Structured packing for mass transfer with flow restricting means
Former [2002/46]Garnissage structuré pour transfert de matiére avec des élements pour réduire l'écoulement le long de la paroi
Examination procedure24.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/46]
11.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2017Fee for grant paid
27.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2006
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
28.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
28.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
29.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
GR08.09.2017
[2018/21]
Former [2017/50]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
GR08.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH1199329  ;
 [X]EP0997189  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 38 * * figures 2-6 *;
 [X]US5224351  (JEANNOT PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * column 8, line 32 - column 9, line 8 * * figures 14,15 *;
 [A]EP0867220  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1,7,10 * column 3, line 11 - line 35 * * figures 1-4; claims 1,4,5 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, [X] 1-6,8,9 * abstract *
by applicantDE3909995
 DE4128675