EP1262596 - Forming section and process for forming a sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halmschlager, Günter Oberer Weinzierlberg 3 3500 Krems / AT | 02 /
Brunnauer, Erich Seilerweg 4 3500 Krems/Rehberg / AT | 03 /
Gansberger, Wilhelm Mariazellerstrasse 32 3200 Ober-Grafendorf / AT | 04 /
Lang, Heinrich Oberer Kirchberg 15 88237 Fronhofen / DE | [2002/49] | Application number, filing date | 02009843.0 | 02.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | DE2001122047 | 07.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10122047 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262596 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1262596 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21F11/04 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
D21F9/006 (EP,US);
D21F11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, IT, SE [2005/43] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Blattbildungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Blattbildung | [2002/49] | English: | Forming section and process for forming a sheet | [2002/49] | French: | Section de formage et procédé de formation d'une feuille | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/07] | 23.09.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9516070 (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,9-12,17,19,20 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,8,13,15; | [X]WO9940256 (VALMET CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-7,9-17,19-21 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE10060263 (VALMET CORP [FI]) [PX] 1-3,5-13,15-21* the whole document * |