Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256774

EP1256774 - Pyrotechnic igniter with an incorporated electronic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 12.09.2007  [2007/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/22]For all designated states
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Görnig, Thomas
Bahnweg 21
85229 Markt-Indersdorf / DE
02 / Wulff, Holger
Habsburgerstrasse 7
85051 Ingolstadt / DE
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/05]
Former [2002/46]Kolb, Georg
DaimlerChrysler AG, Postfach 35 35
74025 Heilbronn / DE
Application number, filing date02009850.502.05.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateDE200112328412.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10123284
[2002/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256774
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256774
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256774
Date:31.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:F42B3/12, F42C19/12
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/39]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Pyrotechnische Zündeinrichtung mit integrierter Elekronikbaugruppe[2002/46]
English:Pyrotechnic igniter with an incorporated electronic circuit[2002/46]
French:Allumeur pyrotechnique comportant un circuit électronique incorporé[2002/46]
Examination procedure11.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
13.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2006Fee for grant paid
21.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
[2007/37]
Former [2007/27]GB31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2006/50]SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE31.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[XD]WO0009964  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1,4-8 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO0040917  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 17; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE19930904  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0279796  (NITRO NOBEL AB [SE]) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 30; figure 4 *
by applicantDE19836278
 DE19836280
 EP0555651
 DE19940201
 DE19610799
 WO9721067
 DE19653115