Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255320

EP1255320 - Band-pass filter and communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2007/37]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sonoda, Tomiya, c/oMurata Manufac. Co., Ltd. IPD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
02 / Hiratsuka, Toshiro c/oMurata Manufac. Co., Ltd. IPD
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
03 / Sasaki, Yutaka, c/oMurata Manufactur. Co., Ltd. IPD
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
04 / Kanagawa, Kiyoshi, c/oMurata Manufac. Co., Ltd. IPD
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
05 / Hirose, Keiichi, c/o (A170) Int. Property Dept.
Murata Manufacturing Co.Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2002/45]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date02009894.302.05.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateJP2001013486302.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001134863
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255320
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1255320
Date:03.09.2003
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01P1/203
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bandpassfilter und Kommunikationsgerät[2002/45]
English:Band-pass filter and communication apparatus[2002/45]
French:Filtre passe-bande et appareil de communication[2002/45]
Examination procedure02.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
07.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
07.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0966055  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-4,9,10 * paragraphs [0030] , [0046]; figures 5,17 *;
 [A]EP0948077  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0024]; figures 1,8A-C *;
 [A]EP0933831  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US6184758  (ISHIKAWA YOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 8-10 * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 3 * * column 8, line 42 - column 10, line 20; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US3760304  (COHN S) [A] 6,7 * column 3, lines 18-45; figures 5A-C,6A *;
 [A]EP0952623  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 6 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]EP0301789  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 7 * column 2, lines 1-12; figure 3 *
 [XA]  MORAUD S ET AL, "A NEW PLANAR TYPE DIELECTRIC RESONATOR FOR MICROWAVE FILTERING", 1998 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST. IMS '98. PROGRESS THROUGH MICROWAVES. BALTIMORE, MD, JUNE 7 - 12, 1998, IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (19980607), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-4472-3, pages 1307 - 1310, XP000825036 [X] 8-10 * page 1308, column L, lines 13-15 * * page 1309, column R, lines 1-21; figures 1,8,10 * [A] 7