blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1255192

EP1255192 - Web enabled recognition architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2008
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Kuansan
16470 SE 48th Court
Bellevue, WA 98006 / US
02 / Hon, Hsiao-Wuen
17797 SE 58th Pl.
Bellevue, WA 98006 / US
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02009961.003.05.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateUS20010289041P04.05.2001         Original published format: US 289041 P
US2001096023220.09.2001         Original published format: US 960232
US2002011714105.04.2002         Original published format: US 117141
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255192
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1255192
Date:14.09.2005
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255192
Date:20.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2005
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/44, H04M3/493, G10L15/28, G10L15/26
[2005/37]
CPC:
G06F1/1698 (EP); G06F1/1626 (EP); G06F3/167 (EP);
G06F40/117 (EP); G10L15/30 (EP); H04M1/72445 (EP);
H04M3/493 (EP); H04M2207/40 (EP); H04M2250/74 (EP);
H04M3/4936 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2002/45]G06F9/44, H04M3/493
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:Webfähige Erkennungsarchitektur[2002/45]
English:Web enabled recognition architecture[2002/45]
French:Architecture de reconnaissance validée sur le web[2002/45]
Examination procedure13.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/15]
06.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2008Fee for grant paid
04.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
TR20.02.2008
LU03.05.2008
IE05.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
GR21.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/37]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
TR20.02.2008
LU03.05.2008
IE05.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2010/32]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
LU03.05.2008
IE05.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/33]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
IE05.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/23]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
IE05.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/12]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
SE20.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/04]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/49]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/46]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
Former [2008/43]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
ES31.05.2008
Former [2008/39]AT20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
ES31.05.2008
Former [2008/35]ES31.05.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0872827  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 26 * * column 5, line 6 - line 15 * * column 6, line 18 - line 51 * * column 7, line 16 - line 34 ** column 11, line 2 - line 20 *;
 [A]US6192338  (HASZTO EDWARD DENNIS [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * figure 4 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 30 * * column 4, line 37 - line 41 * * column 5, line 16 - line 62 * * column 6, line 38 - line 52 * * column 7, line 50 - line 57 *;
 [X]  - HEMPHILL C T AND THRIFT P R, "Surfing the WEB by Voice", PROCEEDINGS ACM MULTIMEDIA, (199511), pages 215 - 222, XP002953305 [X] 1-24 * page 217 * * page 219 - page 220; figure 4 * * page 215, column R, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/217279.215269
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.