Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254647

EP1254647 - Adhesive faceplate for ostomy appliance or wound dressing having mirrored release sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOLLISTER INCORPORATED
2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville
Illinois 60048-3781 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cisko, George J., Jr.
11015 Michigan Drive
Spring Grove, Illinois 60081 / US
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02010063.206.05.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateUS20010288860P04.05.2001         Original published format: US 288860 P
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254647
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/445, A61F13/02
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:Klebe-Platte für Ostomieeinrichtung oder Wundverband mit einer gespiegelten Trennfolie[2002/45]
English:Adhesive faceplate for ostomy appliance or wound dressing having mirrored release sheet[2002/45]
French:Plaque-frontale adhésive pour dispositif d'ostomie ou pansement comportant une feuille détachable à miroir[2002/45]
Examination procedure02.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/27]
28.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/18]
04.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19904315  (HILTROP JOERG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]US5202168  (TURNER GLENN V [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]US4726354  (FUJITA HENRY K [US]);
 [A]US4686355  (LAY LARRY D [US]);
 [A]US4257680  (BACZKOWSKI JOSEPH S)