Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258830

EP1258830 - Method for adjusting a resonating circuit of a passive transponder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 23.06.2010  [2010/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATMEL Germany GmbH
Theresienstrasse 2
74072 Heilbronn / DE
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Feibig, Cordula
Crailsheimer Weg 27
74172 Neckarsulm / DE
02 / Friedrich, Ulrich
Seegartenstrasse 3/3
74248 Ellhofen / DE
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Müller, Wolf-Christian
Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maassstrasse 32/1
69123 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]Müller, Wolf-Christian
Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maassstrasse 32/1
69123 Heidelberg / DE
Former [2003/39](deleted)
...
Former [2002/47]Kolb, Georg
DaimlerChrysler AG, Postfach 35 35
74025 Heilbronn / DE
Application number, filing date02010096.207.05.2002
[2002/47]
Priority number, dateDE200112422218.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10124222
[2002/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1258830
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1258830
Date:11.12.2002
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258830
Date:27.08.2008
Language:DE
[2008/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077, G06K19/07
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/36]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Abgleich eines Antennenschwingkreises eines passiven Transponders[2002/47]
English:Method for adjusting a resonating circuit of a passive transponder[2002/47]
French:Méthode pour l'ajustement d'un circuit résonnant d'un transpondeur passif[2002/47]
Examination procedure07.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
11.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
25.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2008Fee for grant paid
11.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
SE27.11.2008
GB07.05.2009
[2010/25]
Former [2010/09]FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
SE27.11.2008
Former [2009/39]FI27.08.2008
IT27.08.2008
Former [2009/15]FI27.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9840846  (KABA SCHLIESSSYSTEME AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, line 5 - line 29 *;
 [A]US6229443  (ROESNER BRUCE B [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 30 - line 65 *